This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:18:02 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK -VS- LINDA R. MYERS

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LINDA R MYERS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3398

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

MYERS, LINDA R

MYERS, LINDA R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIBAYAN, JONATHAN P

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOC PC

1320 Willow Pass Rd #730

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2015
  • Writ Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for DISCOVER BANK (PL-1). Received from DISCOVER BANK, check no(s) 848523. Receipt #790543 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: To Be, Assigned; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • 117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for DISCOVER BANK (PL-1). Received from DISCOVER BANK, check no(s) 796603. Receipt #728001 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • Abstract Issued - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED 6/20/13 ~ calid=2249172 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/28/2014, Courtroom:BR, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:DPG, Deputy:corrinh, SystemDate:5/16/2013 3:23:28 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: $8,025.92

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to does 1 to 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: PLEASE NOTE THAT DUE TO COURT CLOSURES THIS CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED TO: RIDGECREST BRANCH 132 EAST COSO AVE RIDGECREST, CA 93555 YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 28, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: PLEASE NOTE THAT DUE TO COURT CLOSURES THIS CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED TO: RIDGECREST BRANCH 132 EAST COSO AVE RIDGECREST, CA 93555 YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 28, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: SENT TO RIDGECREST ~ calid=2205294 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:03/24/2014, Courtroom:AK, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:TBA, Deputy:tinag, SystemDate:3/28/2013 2:08:23 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: Summons; Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Alternative Dispute Resolution (adr) Packet; Notice of Case Management Conference; Notice of Order to Show Cause WHO SERVED: LINDA R MYERS HOW SERVED: Personal Service DATE SERVED: 04/09/13 FEE FOR SERVICE: $64.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AK OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 24, 2014 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AK OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • 843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for DISCOVER BANK (PL-1). Received from ABC, check no(s) 776683. Receipt #709648 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less