This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 09:16:32 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS LINCH

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LINCH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0130

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LINCH, BRANDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

TUNDER, JENNIFER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Comment: ANSWER-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: BRANDI LINCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.