This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:05:02 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS HORNING

Case Summary

On 12/01/2015 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HORNING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0204

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HORNING, MIRIAM D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, DENNIS J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; HORNING, MIRIAM D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketStipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: SUMMARY JUDGMENT Hearing Date: 7/22/16 Hearing Time: 10:00 AM Hearing Department/Division:BR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.