This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 08:59:36 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/09/2016 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Phillips, Craig G. and Organ-Bowles, Tiffany. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0103

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Phillips, Craig G.

Organ-Bowles, Tiffany

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HERNANDEZ, IMELDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLEA, AMANDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Organ-Bowles, Tiffany; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: HERNANDEZ, IMELDA; Amount; Damages: $3,780.51; Costs: $294.50; Total: $4075.01; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; HERNANDEZ, IMELDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total $ 4075.01 As To Imelda Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support Of Calculation Of Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As To Imelda Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer(s): Staley, H. A. "Skip", Ross, Edward M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service As To Imelda Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Attempted To Serve Imelda Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DISCOVER BANK; Served: 11/05/20161:39 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketStatement - Comment: Of Venue Pursuant To Code Civil Procedures 395 (b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Endorsed Copy Via ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less