This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 20:20:57 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. ELIZONDO

Case Summary

On 02/25/2015 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELIZONDO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K., Camacho, Marcos R., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9313

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ELIZONDO, BRENDA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATTERSON, ERIN E

Attorney at SUTTELL HAMMER & WHITE

Po Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • Docket4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Docket4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Feb 26, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Feb 26, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 18, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 18, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for DISCOVER BANK (PL-1). Received from SUTTELL & HAMMER, P.S., check no(s) 146937. Receipt #826505 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.