This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:33:25 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS DURAN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DURAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0317

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

DURAN, JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WANG, JERRY

MCDONALD, KRISTEN L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: DURAN, JESUS; Amount; Damages: $5,304.56; Costs: $290.00; Total: $5594.56; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; DURAN, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketStatement - Comment: of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DISCOVER BANK; Served: 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less