Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 05:31:23 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS DELACRUZ

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DELACRUZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0074

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

DELACRUZ, SANDRA D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, HARVEY M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: DELACRUZ, SANDRA D; Amount; Damages: $12,419.25; Costs: $435.00; Total: $12854.25; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; DELACRUZ, SANDRA D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: and Affadavit in Suport of Entry of Default of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1-10 Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DISCOVER BANK; Served: 09/05/201510:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE, HARVEY M