Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:52:49 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS DAY

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0060

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

DAY, FLYNNDA L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLEA, AMANDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: DAY, FLYNNDA L.; Amount; Damages: $1,294.37; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $294.50; Total: $1588.87; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; DAY, FLYNNDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLEA, AMANDA