This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 09:32:26 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS CRAWFORD

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CRAWFORD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0083

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CRAWFORD, JASON D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEBOURN, THOMAS J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: CRAWFORD, JASON D; Amount; Damages: $3,212.07; Costs: $294.50; Total: $3506.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: against defendant Jason D. Crawford.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Non-Military Declaration - Comment: as to Jason D. Crawford.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Declaration - Comment: waiving interest and attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Declaration - Comment: pursuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Jason D. Crawford on Complaint filed 1/3/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Jason D. Crawford via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/06/20206:02 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.