This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:33:21 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS COLDEN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COLDEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5928

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

COLDEN, MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDONALD, KRISTEN L.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: dec and order missing fee

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: OSC continued to 6/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: dec and order missing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less