This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:56:24 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS CASTRO

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASTRO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0967

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CASTRO, BELINDA P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLEA, AMANDA

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Minute Order- Order to Show Cause Re: CRC 3.740-- 1/6/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Minute Order- Order to Show Cause Re: CRC 3.740-- 1/6/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Belinda P Castro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Belinda P Castro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Belinda P Castro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY AMANDA MILLEA

    Read MoreRead Less