This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:57 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS BERNARDINO J MAESTAS AKA BERNARDINO MAESTAS

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BERNARDINO J MAESTAS AKA BERNARDINO MAESTAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1832

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

BERNARDINO J MAESTAS AKA BERNARDINO MAESTAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELLER, STEPHEN S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: ISSUED/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: BERNARDINO J MAESTAS AKA BERNARDINO MAESTAS; Amount; Damages: $6,467.50; Costs: $303.75; Total: $6771.25; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; BERNARDINO J MAESTAS AKA BERNARDINO MAESTAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Against Bernardino J Maestas aka Bernardino Maestas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: declaration re underlying action of account stated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: declaration re amount prayed for in complaint for common counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: declaration re waiver of attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: declaraion in support of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Bernardino J Maestas aka Bernardino Maestas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO BERNARDINO J MAESTAS, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less