Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2021 at 09:34:05 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS BABASHOFF

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BABASHOFF. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0042

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

BABASHOFF, STEVEN W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TANG, JASON W.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANG, JASON W.