This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 08:24:16 (UTC).

DIGIROLAMO VS KERN COUNTY FAIRGROUNDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 DIGIROLAMO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KERN COUNTY FAIRGROUNDS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D., Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1591

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIGIROLAMO, VIKKI

Defendants and Cross Defendants

KERN COUNTY FAIRGROUNDS

COUNTY OF KERN

HARHAUSEN, RHONDA

YARIN, SHARI

KELLY, SHERRY

KERN COUNTY FAIR

STUBBS, DAWN

KLEIN, MAXINE

KERN CANINE ACTIVITIES

THE NORTH AMERICAN DOG AGILITY COUNCIL AKA NADAC, LLC

STEWART, MARY

STUBBS, CHRIS

CLARK, SHARON

NORTH AMERICAN DOG AGILITY COUNCIL AKA NADAC, LLC

KCA: KERN CANINE ACTIVITIES

THE NORTH AMERICAN DOG AGILITY COUNSEL aka NADAC, LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

NORTH AMERICAN DOG AGILITY COUNCIL AKA NADAC, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASHTIAN, MASON

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

COLLINS, CHARLES F

ENERLE, STEPHEN D

ARNALL, ALAN C.

ALLARD-BERNHARDT, VICTORIA R

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

Amended Motion for Summary Judgment 05/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/20/19 Defendant, KCA: KERN CANINE ACTIVITIES Motion for Summary Judgment ResID: 34229

Ruling

Ruling 05/06/2019: Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion to Contest - filed not calendared. No reservation.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Mason Rahtian For: Stipulation Reason: All dates listed on Stipulation are incorrect. Please provide the Court with accurate/correct dates on Stipulation.

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 03/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: cont 01/09/18

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 03/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT 01/09/18 Also set OSC RE; DISMISSAL

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ***Specially set at 8:15 by the Court//Also has CMC DISMISSAL, directed to counsel for Plaintiff and Cross-Complainant to show cause why the Court should not dismiss any/all unserved parties pursuant to CRC rule 3.110 (Set per MO 10/26/17)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

10/26/17 MO: Order to Show Cause re: POS - 3.110: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RASHTIAN, MASON

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES. MISSING FEES OF $150

Demurrer

Demurrer 08/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/8/19 Defendant, KCA: KERN CANINE ACTIVITIES General Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ResID: 35289; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: RASHTIAN, MASON; Defendant; Attorney: ALLARD-BERNHARDT, VICTORIA R

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Request for Dismissal - Cross- Complainant name doesn't conform to the Cross- Complaint - if additional room is needed use an additional page.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 06/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: (b) AS TO THE CROSS COMPLAINT ONLY STATUS OF POS /DEFAULTS ETC.,

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Objection to Order after Hearing - Indicate the date to the order in which you are Objecting to.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Attn: Royce J. Borgeson - re: Application for Good Faith Settlement - Duplicate Filing - Good Faith Settlement for Linda Watson was entered on April 15, 2019. Party was dismissed.

Motion to Contest

Motion to Contest 05/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/12/19; 5/6/19 Amended Notice Defendants, KCA: KERN CANINE ACTIVITIES Motion to Contest Defendant Linda Watson's Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ResID: 34826

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: First Amended Complaint - You must have leave of court to file the First Amended Complaint. The Minute Order from the MSJ on May 6th and the Ruling sent by the Court does not give leave to file an Amended Complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Ruling from MSJ - Notice of Ruling does not conform to Court's Minute Order dating May 6, 2019. Notice of Ruling also does not conform to the Ruling sent out May 6, 2019, setting an Order to Show Cause for June 27, 2019.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Mason Rashtian Re: First Amended Complaint Answers have already been filed in this case, therefore you will need leave of Court in order to file A First Amended Complaint. Thank you.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E 7 DAYS - Cont'd per Stip 4/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice - As to Entire Action - Returned via E-File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: TRJ 02/04/19 - Cont'd per Stip 4/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: Cont'd per Stip 4/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 10/16/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: re: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: as to Complaint - ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: Answer to First Amended Complaint (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer - Demurrer 08/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/8/19 Defendant, KCA: KERN CANINE ACTIVITIES General Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ResID: 35289

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: As to Sherry Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO SHERRY KELLY, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: 1 ATTMEPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO COUNTY OF KERN,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/26/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Served: 07/28/2017; Served: 09/26/2017; Served: 08/07/2017; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.