This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:20:35 (UTC).

DICKERSON VS DICKERSON (D)

Case Summary

On 06/30/2015 DICKERSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DICKERSON D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Benavides, Jose R., Compton, James L., Schuett, Stephen D., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Cannon, Gloria, Robertson, Murray J. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1549

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Benavides, Jose R.

Compton, James L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Cannon, Gloria

Robertson, Murray J.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DICKERSON, GRACIELA

Respondent

DICKERSON, JOSHUA DAVID

 

Court Documents

DCSS Order of Exam

DCSS Order of Exam 07/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Return on Warrant, Joshua David Dickerson, Signed Notice to Appear; Parties Present Respondent: DICKERSON, JOSHUA DAVID

DCSS Order of Exam

DCSS Order of Exam 06/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 04/12/19 DCSS ORDER FOR EXAMINATION 2 MINORS

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET MOD C/V 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA; Respondent: DICKERSON, JOSHUA DAVID

Chambers Conference

Chambers Conference 02/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: in chambers conference with the Minor child at 3:00 p.m.

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 02/08/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EXPARTE C/C C/V 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA; Respondent: DICKERSON, JOSHUA DAVID

Mandatory Settlement Conference

11/17/16 - MO - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: CONT'D FROM 9/29/16; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA; Respondent: DICKERSON, JOSHUA DAVID

Request for Order - Petitioner

10/28/2016 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER- PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET MOD C/V 2 MINORS 16COURT--15COURT; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA; Respondent: DICKERSON, JOSHUA DAVID

Request for Order - Petitioner

08/24/2016 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET WAIVE RES DISCLOSURES; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA

Request for Order - Petitioner

05/24/2016 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET MOD C/V 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA; Respondent: DICKERSON, JOSHUA DAVID

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO JOSHUA DAVID DICKERSON: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00

Request for Order - Petitioner

PET RFO m/o: Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET C/C C/S C/V S/S 2 MINORS 16COURT--15COURT; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA; Respondent: DICKERSON, JOSHUA DAVID

Request for Order - Petitioner

Original Type: Request for Order - Petitioner; REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER RE: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: CS SS - 2 minors Also on JLC cal; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO GRACIELA DICKERSON: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $520; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA

Ex Parte Hearing

M.O. PET EX PARTE: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V 2 MINORS; Parties Present Petitioner: DICKERSON, GRACIELA

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCSS Order of Exam - DCSS Order of Exam 07/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Return on Warrant, Joshua David Dickerson, Signed Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketNotice to Appear Civil Warrant - Comment: Hearing Date: 07/26/2019 Hearing Time: 8:00 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: A Party Ordered to Appear: Respondent, Joshua David Dickerson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCSS Order of Exam - DCSS Order of Exam 06/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 04/12/19 DCSS ORDER FOR EXAMINATION 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re Reissuance of Corrected Writ w/Payment History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Corrected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: FILED BY DCSS OEX SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Appear for Exam (Family Law/DCSS) - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: ENFORCEMNT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketTemporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Compton, James L.; Comment: GRANTED WITH MODIFICATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET C/C C/V 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - M.O. PET EX PARTE: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 7/15/15 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET HRG DATE: 8/5/15 DIV.D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge; Comment: PET HRG 07/17/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.