This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/27/2022 at 07:13:15 (UTC).

DIAZ VS VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 DIAZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1272

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ, LUIS

Defendants

5905 NILES STREET, LLC

5951 NILES, LLC

VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.

VALLARTA PROPERTIES, LLC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

05/13/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

05/16/2022: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

Rejection/Correction Notice

05/19/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Proof of Service (SC-104)

06/14/2022: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Proof of Service (SC-104)

06/14/2022: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Proof of Service (SC-104)

06/14/2022: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Proof of Service (SC-104)

06/14/2022: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Authorization to Appear (Small Claims)

07/08/2022: Authorization to Appear (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

07/12/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

Small Claims Trial

07/08/2022: Small Claims Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties; Comment: (Small Claims); Filed By: DEFENDANT - 5905 NILES STREET, LLC|DEFENDANT - 5951 NILES, LLC|DEFENDANT - VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.|DEFENDANT - VALLARTA PROPERTIES, LLC|PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Small Claims Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Authorization to Appear (Small Claims); Comment: David Alonzo; Filed By: DEFENDANT - 5905 NILES STREET, LLC|DEFENDANT - 5951 NILES, LLC|DEFENDANT - VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.|DEFENDANT - VALLARTA PROPERTIES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: POS-104 on 5951 Niles, LLC; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: POS-104 on 5905 Niles Street, LLC; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: POS-104 on Vallarta Properties, LLC; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: POS-104 on Vallarta Food Enterprises; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Rejection/Correction Notice; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA SC-107; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: By Clerk as to Luis Diaz; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Comment: As to Luis Diaz; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant; Comment: SC100 with SC-100As; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5905 NILES STREET LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLARTA PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant