This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/06/2022 at 20:18:02 (UTC).

DIAZ VS VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 DIAZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1118

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ, LUIS

Defendants

VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.

VALLARTA PROPERTIES, LLC

5951 NILES ST, LLC

5905 NILES STREET, LLC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

02/25/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

Proof of Service (SC-104)

03/22/2022: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Proof of Service (SC-104)

03/22/2022: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Proof of Service (SC-104)

03/22/2022: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Proof of Service (SC-104)

03/22/2022: Proof of Service (SC-104)

Proof of Service by Mail (SC-112A)

03/22/2022: Proof of Service by Mail (SC-112A)

Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

04/21/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

Small Claims Trial

04/15/2022: Small Claims Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties; Comment: (Small Claims); Filed By: DEFENDANT - 5905 NILES STREET, LLC|DEFENDANT - 5951 NILES ST, LLC|DEFENDANT - VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.|DEFENDANT - VALLARTA PROPERTIES, LLC|PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Small Claims Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service by Mail (SC-112A); Comment: POS by Mail for Small Claims Subpoena on all Defendants; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: SC-104 for 5905 Niles Street, LLC; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: SC-104 for 5951 Niles, LLC; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: SC-104 for Vallarta Properties, LLC; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service (SC-104); Comment: SC-104 on Valarta Food Enterprises; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant; Comment: SC-100 and SC-100As 18241; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DIAZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5905 NILES STREET LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLARTA PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant