Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 07:14:19 (UTC).

DIAZ VS ROMERO

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 DIAZ filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ROMERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S., Benavides, Jose R., Shayer, Steven, Wolf, David E. and Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

Benavides, Jose R.

Shayer, Steven

Wolf, David E.

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ

Petitioner

DIAZ, BLANCA ELIZABETH

Defendant

ROMERO

Respondent

ROMERO, MANUEL DE JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DULCICH, JOHN S

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for Order

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for Order

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for Order & Income & Expense

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Findings and Order After Hearing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Motion

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 05/01/2020: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 04/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Wolf, David E.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Declaration

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Order

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Declaration

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Declaration

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/27/2020: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance

Ruling

Ruling 03/20/2020: Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling 02/14/2020: Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 02/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Hearing Date: 4/9/2021 Hearing Time: 9:00 AM Div: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: by the Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDrug Screening Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for Order & Income & Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: Expires on: 03/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: In Pro Per New Attorney: John S. Dulcich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New With Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Romero Motors Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where DIAZ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DULCICH, JOHN S