Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 20:01:08 (UTC).

DIANA L ARMSTRONG DECEASED

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 DIANA L ARMSTRONG DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2919

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SILVA, JEREMIE

SILVA, MANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HODGES, NATHAN M

 

Court Documents

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 03/12/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 02/26/20, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Report of status...returned via file & serve

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 09/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 08/22/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Attorney notice of change of address to attorney Nathan Hodges

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Out Basket for Nathan M Hodges

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letters of appointment

Order to Show Cause

Petition for Letters 09/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: why pending petition should not be dismissed. 09/07/18 CALENDAR #3; Parties Present Petitioner: SILVA, JEREMIE; Attorney: HODGES, NATHAN M

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 06/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need proof of publication. 3. Waivers of bond attached to petition #4 is incomplete re name of personal representative. Need corrected Waivers of Bond.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Special...returned via attorney out basket

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 01/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need proof of publication. 3. Waivers of bond attached to petition #4 is incomplete re name of personal representative. Need corrected Waivers of Bond.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Special...returned via SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters of Special Administration...returned via attorney out basket

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: compliance hearing re: 12200 status report or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 03/12/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 02/26/20, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketInventory with Property Tax Certificate - Comment: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Report of status...returned via file & serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 09/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 08/22/19, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Attorney notice of change of address to attorney Nathan Hodges

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketLetters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Out Basket for Nathan M Hodges

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 06/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need proof of publication. 3. Waivers of bond attached to petition #4 is incomplete re name of personal representative. Need corrected Waivers of Bond.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Special...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 01/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Need proof of publication. 3. Waivers of bond attached to petition #4 is incomplete re name of personal representative. Need corrected Waivers of Bond.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCreditors Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketCreditors Claim - Comment: bank of america $6,803.83

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Special...returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters of Special Administration...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HODGES, NATHAN M