This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/25/2022 at 10:46:39 (UTC).

DI GIACOMO VS FERNANDEZ (D)

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 DI GIACOMO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FERNANDEZ D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Marquez, Raymonda B. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2782

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Marquez, Raymonda B.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DI GIACOMO, LAURA A.

Respondent

FERNANDEZ, DANILO F.

Minor

MINOR'S, COUNSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ETCHEVERRY-BARNES, PAIGE M

Respondent Attorney

CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Minor Attorney

VIZZARD, SARAH

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NEW DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: 7/02/21 PET DVTRO C/C C/V C/S S/S PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS T/E: 3 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: *STATUS & READINESS FOR TRIAL*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/02/21 PET DVTRO C/C C/V C/S S/S PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS CONTD 8/05/21 8/12/21 9/30/21 *STATUS & READINESS FOR TRIAL*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/02/21 PET DVTRO C/C C/V C/S S/S PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS *ONLY ISSUE BEING ADDRESSED: C/S* T/E: 1 HOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Comment: Order HRG 4/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Comment: EXP 04/07/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Marquez, Raymonda B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/02/21 PET DVTRO C/C C/V C/S S/S PROP CNTRL 2 MINORS CONTD 8/05/21 8/12/21 *STATUS FROM MINOR'S COUNSEL*

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NEW DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: Proof of Personal Service (CLETS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (Existing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order Existing With Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter - Comment: E-FILED: Court Interpreter Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MINOR'S COUNSEL is a litigant