This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 18:37:48 (UTC).

DEVILLERS VS HESSEL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 DEVILLERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HESSEL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Friedman - Retired, Gary T. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2166

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEVILLERS, MICHAEL LEE

Defendants

MERCURY INSURANCE

HESSEL, KYLE JULIAN

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MULDER, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned via Mail

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Motion for Terminating Sanctions 02/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/3/2020 Defendant, KYLE JULIAN HESSEL Motion for Terminating Sanctions ResID: 36779

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 06/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: no appearance by Plaintiff on 03/25/2019

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 04/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/25/19 Defendant, MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP Motion for Summary Judgment ResID: 33988

Trial Setting Conference

Motion to Compel 03/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of ruling rejected: Trial setting conference information does not match the Minute order on 2/21/2019. Returned via efile

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 05/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 4/5/18 to allow plaintiff addt'l time to serve

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling 12/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 02/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service Page

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Order, filing rejected at the request of Debbie.

Motion to Continue

Motion to Continue 02/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/22/19 Defendants, KYLE JULIAN HESSEL; MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP Motion to Continue Trial Date or Alternatively to Bifurcate the Trial ResID: 33982

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 02/20/2019: Motion to Compel 03/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/22/19 Defendants, KYLE JULIAN HESSEL; MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses ResID: 33979

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 07/10/2018

Demurrer

Demurrer 07/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/7/18 Defendant, MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint ResID: 31121

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 07/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: THEREFORE, Plaintiff MICHAEL LEE DEVILLERS Complaint as against Defendant KYLE JULIAN HESSEL is hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. All pending court dates are hereby vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: FCMC/Jury Trial 03/23/2020 (17) T/E 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned via Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Minuted dated 02/06/2020 as to MICHAEL LEE DEVILLERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Minuted dated 02/05/2020, as to MICHAEL LEE DEVILLERS, no forwarding address provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 02/06/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions 02/05/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/3/2020 Defendant, KYLE JULIAN HESSEL Motion for Terminating Sanctions ResID: 36779

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service Page

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 01/11/2018 AND FAILING TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 2ND CONTINUANCE. PLAINTIFF FTA ON 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 12/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO MICHAEL LEE DEVILLERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:01/02/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO MICHAEL LEE DEVILLERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less