This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/10/2020 at 16:48:56 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK V. KUROWSKI

Case Summary

On 06/04/2010 DEUTSCHE BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KUROWSKI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9355

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE

Defendant

KUROWSKI, H. SKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENDRES, DAVID R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2012
  • DocketCase Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section - Comment: DISTROYED 9/15/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: COSTS: $103.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ~ calid=1279369 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:09/13/2010, Courtroom:AT, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:CP, Deputy:donnas2, SystemDate:6/4/2010 2:14:23 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEY CERTIFIED SERVICES, check no(s) 20821. Receipt #533137 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: TO KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1 TO 5 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: RE: H. SKI KUROWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2010
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE NO FORWARDING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: RE: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS COST: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: RE: H SKI KUROWSKI COST: $102.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Sep 13, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ CRAIG PHILLIPS Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Sep 13, 2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AT OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ CRAIG PHILLIPS Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • Docket841H Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee < $10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $220.00 for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEY'S CERTIFIED SVC, check no(s) 20775. Receipt #527435 for amount of $220.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 578

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF ENRES AND ESTLE - DAVID R ENDRES