This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:43 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK VS ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ORTEGA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5771

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

ORTEGA, YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO, ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK; Awarded Against: ORTEGA, YOLANDA; Amount; Damages: $3,424.03; Costs: $282.50; Total: $3706.53; Party: Names: DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK; ORTEGA, YOLANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Notice of Stay of Proceeding - Comment: AS TO YOLANDA ORTEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Against Yolanda Ortega / Damages $3,424.03, Costs $282.50, Total Judgment $3,706.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Of Counsel RE: Interest; Costs CCP 1033, and Attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Yolanda Ortega

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Yolanda Ortega. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less