This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:49 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5773

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

HERNANDEZ, MARTHA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERRILL, DONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice; CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Order on Settlement Agreement & Stipulation (JBSIS) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Stipulation - Comment: settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Martha A Hernandez. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less