This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:17:06 (UTC).

Dent-A-Med, Inc. dba HC Processing Center VS Macias

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Dent-A-Med, Inc dba HC Processing Center filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Macias. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0006

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dent-A-Med, Inc. dba HC Processing Center

DENT-A-MED INC. DBA HC PROCESSING CENTER

Defendant

Macias, Alicia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENEIN, SAMY S

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: of Samy S. Henein RE: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.