Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 04:02:36 (UTC).

DENNIS SORGES DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 DENNIS SORGES DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2488

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IRWIN, AMBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

WERNER, TROY

MONAHAN, RICHARD V

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Discharge order...returned via file & serve

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 04/24/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: First and final account...returned via SASE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Final account...returned via file & serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for approval...returned via file & serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition and Inventory...returned via file & serve

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 11/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 10/26/18, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Inventory & Appraisal

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER & LETTERS MAIL

Petition for Letters

11/02/2017 MO: Petition for Letters: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Order and Letters...returned via SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for special...returned via SASE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Special...returned via file & serve

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 06/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge & Order-Estate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Discharge order...returned via file & serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketReceipt - Comment: Receipt for Distribution (Amber)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketReceipt - Comment: Receipt of Distribution (Rima Collins Sorges)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketJudgment and Order for Final Distribution - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order approving petition for first and final account, report of activities; and for approval of compensation and final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 04/24/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Amber Irwin in Response to Probate Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for special...returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Special...returned via file & serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 06/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney - Comment: Notice of Association of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCreditors Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONAHAN, RICHARD V

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERNER TROY ALEXANDER