This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:45:39 (UTC).

DENNIS KEITH COOPER DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 DENNIS KEITH COOPER DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Knight, Alisa R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3025

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Knight, Alisa R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OXFORD, PAMELA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JOHNSON, J DEAN

 

Court Documents

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having PREVIOUSLY been confined. 2. Statutory fee calculation in paragraph 24 is incorrect and should be $6,432.26.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JOHNSON, J DEAN

Petition for Probate of Will

12/08/16 MO: Petition for Probate of Will: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of publication. 2. Need copy of Trust to be filed or lodged.

Petition for Probate of Will

MO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JOHNSON, J DEAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • Receipt - Comment: Receipt on Final Distribution, Attorney's Fees and Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Receipt - Comment: Receipt on Final Distribution, Executor's Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Receipt - Comment: Receipt on Final Distribution, Pamela J. Oxford, Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Judgment and Order Settling Account - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: First and Final Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having PREVIOUSLY been confined. 2. Statutory fee calculation in paragraph 24 is incorrect and should be $6,432.26.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JOHNSON, J DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Supplement - Comment: Supplement to First and FInal Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Compliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Final Account and Report and Petition for Distribution - Comment: First and final account and report of executor and petition for its settlement, for allowance of compensation to executor for ordinary services compensation to attorney for ordinary services and reimbursement of costs advanced by attorney and for final distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2017
  • Order For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Will Admitted - Comment: BRW-16-001255

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will - MO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: JOHNSON, J DEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Trust of Dennis Cooper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will - 12/08/16 MO: Petition for Probate of Will: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTES - 1. Need proof of publication. 2. Need copy of Trust to be filed or lodged.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 12/08/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Last Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-16-001255 10/1/15 Five (5) pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less