This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 08:21:54 (UTC).

DELIA FABELA VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/31/2016 DELIA FABELA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2044

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FABELA, DELIA

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIKHOV, STEVE B

ALTMAN, BRYAN C

Defendant Attorneys

PROUDFOOT, MATTHEW M

CUNNINGHAM, J. BLAKE

MAUCH, MARION V

HUGRET, SPENCER P

TAKAHASHI, BRIAN

JOHNSON, PAUL

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: CMC Statement - Please file the proper Final CMC documents. CMC Statements are not needed.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: e: Motion in Limine No. 1-17: Per telephone conversion with Chris- Will pull (Proposed) Orders out of Motions and re-fill JUST the Motions. AND the Proof of Service needs a Proper Face Page CRC 2.111

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration - missing cover page.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Amended Notice of Motion - Reservation expired.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion for protective order and Motion for relief -- Motions are filed but not calendared. The street address of the court is incorrect.

Ruling

02/27/2017 Minute Order: Ruling on Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint: Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling; Comment: ruling on demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint heard 02/24/2017

Demurrer

Demurrer 02/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/25/17 Defendant, FORD MOTOR COMPANY Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ResID: 23822 *************************************************** TENTATIVE: SUSTAIN DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AS TO THE THIRD, FOURTH AND FIFTH CAUSES OF ACTION, AS EACH IS BARRED BY THE ECONOMIC LOSS RULE. THERE IS NO APPRECIABLE, NONSPECULATIVE, PRESENT INJURY ALLEGED. **************************************************

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Demurrer to First Amended Complaint - no fees

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/14/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:4

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Repsonse to Ex Parte - Noticed for the incorrect time and date of Ex Parte hearing.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Ex Parte Application - Please separte the (Proposed) Order from the Ex Parte Application - Once filed we cannot separate the documents.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Proof of Service - 2.111 First Page Format

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 09/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 9/27/19 by Defendant, Ford Motor Company. Ex Parte Application for Admission of Attorney Andrew L. Richardson Pro Hac Vice

Motion to Bifurcate

Motion to Bifurcate 09/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/3/19 Defendant, FORD MOTOR COMPANY Motion to Bifurcate Punitive Damages ResID: 35761

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Motion to Set Priority Trial Date

Motion to Set Priority Trial Date 02/01/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/10/18; 1/7/19 Amended Notice Plaintiff, DELIA FABELA Motion to Lift Stay and Reset Trial Date ResID: 33818

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Motion to Lift Stay - not calendared, no reservation

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E: 7-10 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: JURY TRIAL 10/28/19 T/E: 7-10 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: FCMC 7/24/20, JT 8/3/20 T/E 7-10 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Submission of Case to Pending JCCP Proceeding / Notice of Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketReporter's Transcript - Comment: Re Proceedings of September 25, 2019 Reporter Amy Maier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Association of Counsel. Associating Paul R. Johnson for Defendant's counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 10/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 10/9/19, by Plaintiff, Delia Fabela. Ex Parte to Continue Trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Ford Motor Company's Response to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Declaration of Amy MaClear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Repsonse to Ex Parte - Noticed for the incorrect time and date of Ex Parte hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: Envelope #319708 Document: Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Complaint Rejected pursuant to your instructions are being rejected for corrections.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketDeclaration (Meet and Confer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Date: 11/30/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/31/20163:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/14/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less