This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:53 (UTC).

DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS TEJEDA

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TEJEDA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6656

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

TEJEDA, JORGE CHIPRES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2013
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice - Comment: NO PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: NO PROOF OF SERVICE. ~ calid=2212346 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:06/24/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LSE, Deputy:lanaes, SystemDate:4/8/2013 11:22:07 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • 854D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee > 12 Claims in 12 Months - Comment: Amount of $100.00 for DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. (PL-1). Received from PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORPORATION, check no(s) 16560. Receipt #711035 for amount of $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 659

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: GLANDA FUENTES FOR DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES RETURNED IN PICK UP BIN.

    Read MoreRead Less