This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:20:02 (UTC).

DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP VS ALEMAN

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALEMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6661

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

ALEMAN, JULIE YESENIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: 1053.5230/40cont'd from 06/24/13-per stip between parties 1053.5230/40cont'd from 06/24/13-per stip between parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 9/23/13 ~ calid=2280539 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:09/24/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:2, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ashleyn, SystemDate:6/25/2013 7:29:36 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: GLENDA FUENTES APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. JULIE YESENIA ALEMAN (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 9/24/2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DIV/DEPT 12 FOR HEARING ON CAL: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL BEFORE THE HON. LINDA S ETIENNE OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER. REASON FOR NEXT APPEARANCE: AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • 4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP; Defendant: ALEMAN, JULIE YESENIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO JULIE YESENIA ALEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • 854D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee > 12 Claims in 12 Months - Comment: Amount of $100.00 for DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP (PL-1). Received from PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORPORATION, check no(s) 17079. Receipt #711046 for amount of $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: GLENDA FUENTES APPEARING FOR DELAWARE FINANCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES RETURNED VIA PICK UP BIN

    Read MoreRead Less