This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/07/2020 at 16:06:41 (UTC).

DELATORRE VS VALLE

Case Summary

On 06/25/2007 DELATORRE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VALLE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5186

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELATORRE, SALVADOR

Defendants

VALLE, CATARINO

VALLE, MARIA DEJESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2007
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 9/11/07 BY: A.ABRICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • Docket4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) - Comment: New Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2007
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF SANDRA MCCORMACK AND ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE GARY R. WITT DATE: 9/11/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2007
  • DocketCase Management Conference Vacated - Comment: DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2007
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY: KERN ISSUED: 9/11/07 BY: A.ABRICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2007
  • Docket115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $15.00 for DELATORRE, SALVADOR (PL-1). Received from SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK, check no(s) 8024. Receipt #338752 for amount of $15.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2007
  • DocketJudgment - Comment: FOR PLAINTIFF: SALVADOR DE LA TORRE POSSESSION ONLY SIGNED BY: CLERK, A.ABRICA DATE: 9/11/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • DocketNP1490 - Comment: Department: AL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2007
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ATTORNEY STEVEN BOSTA MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK ESQ ON BEHALF OF SALVADOR DELATORRE (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY CATRINO VALLE (DE-1). NO APPEARANCE BY MARIA DE JESUS VALLE (DE-2). MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE TO 09/20/07 AT 1:30PM BY COUNSEL GRANTED. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):08/23/07-2:33PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2007
  • DocketNP1850 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE MANAGEMENT SALVADOR DELATORRE (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT CATARINO VALLE NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT MARIA VALLE DEFENDANTS HAVE NOT BEEN SERVED PLAINTIFF REQUEST CONTINUANCE THE COURT ORDERS THE CLERK TO ISSUE AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO THE STATUS OF CASE TO SHOW WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED OR OTHER SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 8/23/2007 1:30 PM NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • Docket4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) - Comment: New Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference Unlawful Detainer; Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • Docket841F Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee < $10,000 GC 70613(B); CCP - Comment: Amount of $195.00 for DELATORRE, SALVADOR (PL-1). Received from SALVADOR DELATORRE. Receipt #321466 for amount of $195.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 129

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN