This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:54 (UTC).

DEBT RESOLVE LLC VS LEDESMA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 DEBT RESOLVE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEDESMA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0218

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBT RESOLVE LLC

Defendants

LEDESMA, TIFFANY

TIFFANY C. LEDESMA AKA TIFFANY C. WOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA PICK UP FOR JOE DEVERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA PICK UP FOR ABC LEGAL (JOE DEVERS)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: 1788.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Court Entered - Comment: AGAINST TIFFANY C. LEDESMA AKA TIFFANY C. WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AGAINST DOES 1 TO 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR TIFFANY C. LEDESMA AKA TIFFANY C. WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of reduced filing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less