This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:53:48 (UTC).

DEBT RESOLVE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS NICHOLAS BRAGG AKA NICHOLAS L. BRAGG JR AKA NICHOLAS L. WILLIS AKA NICHOLAS BROGG

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 DEBT RESOLVE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NICHOLAS BRAGG AKA NICHOLAS L BRAGG JR AKA NICHOLAS L WILLIS AKA NICHOLAS BROGG. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1541

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBT RESOLVE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

NICHOLAS BRAGG AKA NICHOLAS L. BRAGG JR AKA NICHOLAS L. WILLIS AKA NICHOLAS BROGG

BRAGG, NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

Defendant Attorney

CONNOLLY, CROSBY S

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 08/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: crc 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: and Final Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 08/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: GRANTED BY COMMISSIONER **ETIENNE** AS TO NICHOLAS BRAGG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketAnswer - Comment: AS TO NICHOLAS BRAGG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO NICHOLAS BRAGG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to Nicholas Bragg aka Nichola L Bragg Jr. Personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.