This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 05:08:42 (UTC).

DE MASCIO VS ANDREWS

Case Summary

On 10/26/2015 DE MASCIO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDREWS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R. and Staley, H.A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0110

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE MASCIO, KARRIE J

Defendant

ANDREWS, KAYLA BERLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEBIG, STEVEN J

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition

MO-Ex-parte Motion: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Ruling; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SIEBIG, STEVEN J; Defendant: ANDREWS, KAYLA BERLIN

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: DE MASCIO, KARRIE J; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 2816 Highland Way Los Padres Estates, CA 93243; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: ANDREWS, KAYLA BERLIN; Party: Names: DE MASCIO, KARRIE J; ANDREWS, KAYLA BERLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Writ Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 2816 Highland Way Lebce, CA 93243

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition - MO-Ex-parte Motion: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Ruling; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SIEBIG, STEVEN J; Defendant: ANDREWS, KAYLA BERLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Order Shortening Time - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Ex Parte Application & Order - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Property:2816 Highland Way Los Padres Estates, CA 93243 Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: by Substituted Service as to All Unamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Kayla Berlin Andrews

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Any and All Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DE MASCIO, KARRIE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 2816 HIGHLAND WAY LOS PADRES ESTATES CA 93243 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less