This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 07:31:00 (UTC).

DE LEON VS FCA US LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 DE LEON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2005

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Clark, Thomas S., Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LEON, VIRIDIANA GARCIA

Defendants

FCA US LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY

BAKERSFIELD DODGE, INC.

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAMSE, GABRIELLE M

Defendant Attorney

HANSON, ERIN E

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/14/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service: Cindie per our conversation, please resubmit Proof of Service, we were unable to process the PDF. Please rescan and resubmit. Thank you.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Bakersfield Dodge, Inc. DBA Haddad Dodge, a California corporation via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service: Cindie per our conversation, please resubmit Proof of Service, we were unable to process the PDF. Please rescan and resubmit. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 09/10/20218:23 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/14/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAKERSFIELD DODGE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANSON ERIN E.