This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:34:54 (UTC).

DE LA TORRE VS ROJAS

Case Summary

On 07/02/2015 DE LA TORRE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROJAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Turner, Jerold L., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0026

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Turner, Jerold L.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA TORRE, RAFAEL TORRES

Defendant

ROJAS, CRISANTO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Staley, H. A. "Skip", Turner, Jerold L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: DE LA TORRE, RAFAEL TORRES; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 449 Holden St Arvin, CA 93203; Awarded Against: ROJAS, CRISANTO; Party: Names: DE LA TORRE, RAFAEL TORRES; ROJAS, CRISANTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 449 Holden St Arvin, CA 93203 Returned Original via In Pro Per/Counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: For Possession only as to Crisanto Rojas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Crisanto Rojas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketFee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: **CONFIDENTIAL** As to Rafael Torres De la Torre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DE LA TORRE, RAFAEL TORRES; Served: 07/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 449 HOLDEN ST ARVIN, CA 93203 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via In ProPer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.