This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 02:54:35 (UTC).

DE FERNANDEZ VS CAMARENA

Case Summary

On 07/03/2014 DE FERNANDEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAMARENA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6167

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE FERNANDEZ, MARIA JIMENEZ

Defendants

CAMARENA, MATEO

CAMARENA, JUAN MANUEL

TERAN, JUANA MARIA

CAMARENA, MARIA

CAMARENA, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H

 

Court Documents

Motion (Post-Disposition)

02/17/16 MO - MOTION (POST-DISPOSITION) TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 1/20/16 by Defendants, Juan Camarena and Maria Camarena. Motion to Pay Judgment in Installments; Parties Present Defendant: CAMARENA, JUAN; Defendant: CAMARENA, MARIA

Motion (Post-Disposition)

Minute Order- Motion 11/4/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/5/15 Defendants, JUAN CAMARENA & MARIA CAMARENA Motion to Pay Judgment in Installments; Parties Present Defendant: CAMARENA, JUAN

Motion for Judgment on Pleadings

Minute Order- Motion for judgment on pleadings: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/9/15 Plaintiff, MARIA JIMENEZ DE FERNANDEZ Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Further Case Management Conference

8/3/15 Further CMC: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ALSO HAS OSC (CONT'D FROM 06/03/15); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H; Defendant: CAMARENA, JUAN

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

8/3/15 OSC: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 03/30/15; 06/03/15; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRUMFIELD, ROBERT H; Defendant: CAMARENA, JUAN

Order to Show Cause

Minute Order-OSC re 3.110 6/3/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: CRC, RULE 3.110CONT'D FROM 3/30/2015; Parties Present Defendant: CAMARENA, JUAN; Defendant: CAMARENA, MARIA

Case Management Conference

Minute Order-CMC 6/3/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: CAMARENA, JUAN; Defendant: CAMARENA, MARIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: of Order Regarding Motion to Pay Judgment in Installments.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • DocketOrder on Motion - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to pay judgment in installments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (Post-Disposition) - 02/17/16 MO - MOTION (POST-DISPOSITION) TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 1/20/16 by Defendants, Juan Camarena and Maria Camarena. Motion to Pay Judgment in Installments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Mailed 2/5/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketOpposition to Motion - Comment: for Order Providing for Installment Payments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketAmended Notice - Comment: of Insufficient Funds.

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketNP1511 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CRC 3.110 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MARIA JIMENEZ DE FERNANDEZ (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. GLORIA HUGHES CERTIFIED TO INTERPRET THE SPANISH LANGUAGE, PRESENT TO INTERPRET PROCEEDING FOR PLAINTIFF. OATH ON FILE. *************************************************************************************** CAUSE HEARD AND SUBMITTED. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 12/18/2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DIV/DEPT 12 FOR HEARING ON CAL: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BEFORE THE HON. LINDA S ETIENNE OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • Docket4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Docket844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for DE FERNANDEZ, MARIA JIMENEZ (PL-1). Received from MARIA JIMENEZ DE FERNANDEZ, check no(s) 3226. Receipt #788851 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: OSC 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 16, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Oct 16, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY MARIA JIMENEZ DE FERNANDEZ IN PRO PER RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "F"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.