Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 13:55:44 (UTC).

DAVENPORT VS ROSEDALE UNION SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 DAVENPORT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROSEDALE UNION SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2104

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVENPORT, MATTHEW R

Defendants

GEISSEL, GRACIE

ROSEDALE UNION SCHOOL DISTRICT

HORACK, BRIAN

NORTH OF THE RIVER PARKS AND RECREATION DISTRICT ("NOR")

CARTER, JAXSON

NORTH OF THE RIVER PARKS AND RECREATION DISTRICT

HORACK, BRAD

CARTER, DWAYNE

CARTER, TONI

CARTER, JAXEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRILL, THOMAS A

Defendant Attorneys

ZIMMER, WILLIAM T.

HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER J

THOMASIAN, ELIZABETH A

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal (Envelope Id #6504805) This case involves a minor. Please include a correspondence or declaration with this request for dismissal. In the interest of the minor, the court needs to know why a petition for minor's compromise is not necessary.

Ruling

Ruling 05/04/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Settlement Unconditional (Envelope Id #6354888) Need to insert date of dismissal #1a. Matter should be "conditional" as a Petition for Minors Compromise for Matthew Russell Davenport must be submitted. If no petition is required the court must be advised in writing asking the Court to enter dismissal once it is submitted.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/08/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 03/08/2021

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons/Complaint as to Brian Horack Duplicate filing received. Matter filed as of 10/22/2020.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/23/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter from: Thomas A. Brill Date of Letter: 05/24/2021 Re: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice, complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal (Envelope Id #6504805) This case involves a minor. Please include a correspondence or declaration with this request for dismissal. In the interest of the minor, the court needs to know why a petition for minor's compromise is not necessary.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Copy of 3/04/2021 Minute Order addressed to Christopher J. Hagan 2031 F. Street, Bakersfield, CA 93301. Remailed on 5/18/2021 to address noted on the returned envelope: Christopher J. Hagan Hagan Law Group 4200 Truxtun Ave Ste 101, Bakersfield, CA 93309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: continued from 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 03/08/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: continued from 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 05/04/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to North of the River Parks and Recreation District (NOR) - Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Rosedale Union School District - Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: DEFENDANTS NORTH OF THE RIVER PARKS & RECREATION DISTRICT AND GRACIE GEISSEL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Comment: as to Matthew Russell Davenport

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/30/2020; Served: 09/29/2020; Served: 01/26/20216:09 PM; Unserved; Served: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/23/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSEDALE UNION SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILL, THOMAS A