This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:02:36 (UTC).

DAVE MEZA VS PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2015 DAVE MEZA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Etienne, Linda S., Lampe, David R., Schuett, Stephen D. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1572

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Etienne, Linda S.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVE MEZA, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

Fifth District Court of Appeal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DION-KINDEM, PETER R

BLANCHARD, LONNIE C

Defendant Attorneys

KAUFMAN, THOMAS R

BERTRAND, RAYMOND W

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling ON DEFENDANT S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT: Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 08/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/12/19 Defendant, PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY Motion to Strike Paga Representative Claims ResID: 35314

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: set by the court.

Ruling

Ruling ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPNAY TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE THIRD AMENDED: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 05/29/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/30/19 CMC SET 05/31/2019 Defendant, PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY Motion to Strike Portions of Third Amended Complaint ResID: 34771

Ruling

Ruling 04/16/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition) 04/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/5/19 Plaintiff, DAVE MEZA Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ResID: 34413; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BLANCHARD, LONNIE C; Attorney: DION-KINDEM, PETER R; Defendant; Attorney: KAUFMAN, THOMAS R

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion for Leave - Noticed for the wrong department

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 10-15 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: TRJ 08/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Comment: FCMC 7/31/20, JT 8/10/20 T/E 10-15 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Adjudication - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 2/13/2020 Defendant, PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues Hearing continued per standing order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Amanda Myette in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: re Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice - Comment: in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Raymond W. Bertrand in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSeparate Statement of Undisputed Facts - Comment: in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: in support of Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
177 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: To stay portion of case overlapping with certified class action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/16/201511:48 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Pacific Bell Telephone Company personal service 12/16/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: [1st Amended] Electronically Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE - #6d incomplete for service and CCP requried returned via ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/15/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fifth District Court of Appeal is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAUFMAN THOMAS ROY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERTRAND RAYMOND