This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 11:33:47 (UTC).

DARDEN VS BULK TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 DARDEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BULK TRANSPORTATION, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2449

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARDEN, ALEXIS DONNISHA

Defendants

BARRERA, DAVID ISLAS

BULK TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI, DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

WORTHING, MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/14/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Ruling

Minute Order 03/21/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 03/21/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: As to Bulk Transportation and David Islas Barrera

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to David Islaas Barrera. Personal Service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Bulk transportation, Inc. Substituted Service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/15/2018; Served: 11/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/14/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via E File

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less