Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 19:31:54 (UTC).

DANIEL G. HIPOLITO-ORTIZ IRREVOCABLE SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 DANIEL G HIPOLITO-ORTIZ IRREVOCABLE SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2915

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ORTIZ HIPOLITO, BRAULINA

ULRICH, ESQ, SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KATZEN, SUSAN A

 

Court Documents

Review

Review 12/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Review Hearing on Status of Case Transferred-In from Riverside County

Ruling

Ruling 11/04/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: compliance hearing re: filing of first account and report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 12/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Review Hearing on Status of Case Transferred-In from Riverside County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Transfer of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 11/04/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRecords Received - Comment: Receipt for Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOrder After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Officer, Other Judicial; Comment: Order Establishing Special Needs Trust for the Benefit of Daniel G. Hipolito-Ortiz, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition to Establish Special Needs Trust for the Benefit of Daniel G. Hipolito-Ortiz; etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRegister of Actions / Docket Change of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOrder / Transfer In - Judicial Officer: Officer, Other Judicial; Comment: Hearing re: review if matter can be transferred to Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATZEN, SUSAN A