Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 08:09:52 (UTC).

DAN B QUIROZ DECEASED

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 DAN B QUIROZ DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Stein, Cameryn and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2662

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Stein, Cameryn

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELIAS, SHELLEY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MCINTOSH, THOMAS S

TRAVIS, JEFFREY A

 

Court Documents

Petition

Petition 10/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Verified petition to establish estate's claim of ownership to property and for an order directing its transfer to estate of Daniel B Quiroz pursuant to California probate code 850(a)(2)(c) and (d) 10/25/18 CALENDAR #2

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 09/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - NOTE - 1. As of 09/10/18, 12200 status report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER & LETTERS ATTY BIN

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 09/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: ELIAS, SHELLEY L; Attorney: MCINTOSH, THOMAS S

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative and Confidential Supplement to Duties....Attorney Bin

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN

Ruling

Ruling 08/16/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: STIPULATION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT JUDGMENT RE ORDER REGARDING VERIFIED PETITION TO ESTABLISH ESTATE'S CLAIM OF OWNERSHIP TO PROPERTY, FOR ORDER DIRECTING ITS TRANSFER TO THE ESTATE OF DANIEL B. QUIROZ AND OTHER REQUESTED RELIEF

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Stipulation & order...returned via file & serve

Petition

Petition 05/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- VERIFIED PETITION TO ESTABLISH ESTATE'S CLAIM OF OWNERSHIP TO PROPERTY AND FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING ITS TRANSFER TO ESTATE OF DANIEL B. QUIROZ PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA PROBATE CODE 850(a)(2)(C) AND (D) 05/02/2019 CALENDAR #1

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 05/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Compliance Hearing Re Filing of Petition to Close Estate or Probate Code 12200 Status Report 05/02/2019 CALENDAR #2

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte Application; returned via file & serve

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Status Brief; returned via attorney out basket "T"

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objections

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTY BIN

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance; Comment: Re Filing of Petition to Close Estate or Probate Code 12200 Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: Waiver of Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Confidential filing - settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting - Comment: Petition for Final Distribution of Estate Assets on Waiver of Accounting; for Payment of Statutory and Extraordinary Attorney's Fees and Costs; and for Discharge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketWithdrawal of Creditors Claim - Comment: Withdrawal of Creditors Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order (1) setting aside order regarding verified petition to establish estate's claim of ownership to property, for order directing its transfer to the estate of Daniel B. Quiroz and other requested relief and (2) dismissing petition with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 11/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- STIPULATION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT JUDGMENT RE ORDER REGARDING VERIFIED PETITION TO ESTABLISH ESTATE'S CLAIM OF OWNERSHIP TO PROPERTY, FOR ORDER DIRECTING ITS TRANSFER TO THE ESTATE OF DANIEL B. QUIROZ AND OTHER REQUESTED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 09/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-17-001177 7/26/16 Two (2) pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative and Confidential Supplement to Duties....Attorney Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAVIS, JEFFREY A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCINTOSH, THOMAS S