This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/06/2021 at 09:04:43 (UTC).

CYNTHIA HARRISON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 CYNTHIA HARRISON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2335

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WALTERS, YVONNE

HARRISON-SMITH, ELISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STROH, HERBERT A

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Affidavit of small value; returned via envelope provided

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: affidavit re real property of small value...returned to Herbert A. Stroh via sase

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAffidavit/Small Value - Comment: Affidavit Re Real Property of Small Value; Will dated 12/26/1978; $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Affidavit of small value; returned via envelope provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: affidavit re real property of small value...returned to Herbert A. Stroh via sase

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROH, HERBERT A.