This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 12:29:32 (UTC).

CURCH VS RICHARDSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/21/2003 CURCH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARDSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4207

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURCH, BRYAN GERALD

ACKER, THOMAS ELI

Defendants

RICHARDSON, ROD

BIG HUN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OURFALIAN, SARKIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2004
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2004
  • DocketNotice of Settlement-Rule 225 - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2004
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANTS- RICHARD B. PELLEGRINO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: FILED BY COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF - SARKIS OURFALIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2003
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FOR BIG HUN AND ROD RICHARDSON FILED BY RICHARD PELLEGRINO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2003
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2003
  • Docket844A Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint >$10,000 (8/17/03) - Comment: Amount of $272.50 for BIG HUN INC. (DE-2). Received from RICHARD PELLEGRINO, check no(s) 3013. Receipt #55688 for amount of $272.50.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2003
  • Docket844A Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint >$10,000 (8/17/03) - Comment: Amount of $272.50 for RICHARDSON, ROD (DE-1). Received from RICHARD PELLEGRINO, check no(s) 3013. Receipt #55686 for amount of $272.50.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2003
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET- STATEMENT OF LOCATION WHO: BIG HUN, INC., A NEVADA CORP. HOW: MAILING, TO AN ADDRESS OUTSIDE CALIFORNIA WITH RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED WHEN: 08/28/03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2003
  • DocketOriginal Summons Returned - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2003
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2003
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2003
  • Docket863 Pmt: Court Reporter Fee GC 68086(A)(4) (8/11/03) - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for BURCH, BRYAN GERALD (PL-1). Received from OURFALIAN, check no(s) 4342. Receipt #45238 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2003
  • Docket844A Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint >$10,000 (8/17/03) - Comment: Amount of $272.50 for BURCH, BRYAN GERALD (PL-1). Received from OURFALIAN, check no(s) 23812. Receipt #45237 for amount of $272.50.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2003
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OURFALIAN SARKIS ANTRANIK