This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 10:25:24 (UTC).

CUMBRY VS DAVIS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 CUMBRY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DAVIS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Foley, Therese M. and Cervantes, Gina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1036

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Foley, Therese M.

Cervantes, Gina

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CUMBRY, WILLIE

Respondent

DAVIS, RANEY

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW (2ND REQUEST) FEES: $435.00

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW (2ND REQUEST) FEES: $435.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW (2ND REQUEST) FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied/Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: TOTAL FEES DUE: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Comment: 2ND REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: 2ND REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Comment: HRG 01/17/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.