This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 09:45:53 (UTC).

CUEVAS VS CUEVAS

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 CUEVAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CUEVAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0243

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CUEVAS, SHERRIE

Respondent

CUEVAS, JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: CUEVAS, SHERRIE; CUEVAS, JOSHUA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: STATUS DATE 6/22/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL LEGAL DOC PREP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less