This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 01:43:42 (UTC).

CSW CONTRACTORS, INC. VS WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/11/2018 CSW CONTRACTORS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS ALMONDS, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1420

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CSW CONTRACTORS, INC.

Defendant

WONDERFUL ORCHARDS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARUCCI, ANTHONY J.

Defendant Attorneys

WU, NATASHA M.

HOSTETLER, H FRANKLIN, III

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF JURY DEPOSIT ADDRESSED

Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Case Management Conference (N40U): Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 09/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Continued Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Case Management Conference (N40U): Case Management Conference 07/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: TRANSFER-IN FROM LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF JURY DEPOSIT ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketAmended Notice - Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 7-30-18, 8:30 AM, D-11 (refer to minute order dated 5-7-18 issued in BCV-18-100672)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC,. THE WONDERFUL COMPANY, LLC, AND WONDERFUL ORCHARDS HOLDINGS, LLC ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Stipulation and Order to Extend Defendants Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC, The Wonderful Company, LLC, Wonderful Orchards, LLC, and Wonderful Orchards Holdings, LLV's time to respond to CSW Contractors, Inc.'s Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE/ WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE/ WONDERFUL ORCHARDS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE / THE WONDERFUL COMPANY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE / WONDERFUL ORCHARDS HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSW CONTRACTORS, INC., AN ARIZONA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wu, Natasha M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOSTETLER HARRY FRANKLIN III