This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:21 (UTC).

CRUZ VS MERCADO

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 CRUZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MERCADO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0076

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRUZ, EDUARDO ROBLES

Respondent

MERCADO, ROSA CARRILLO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: CRUZ, EDUARDO ROBLES; MERCADO, ROSA CARRILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: CRUZ, EDUARDO ROBLES; Served: 04/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less