This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:09:26 (UTC).

CRUZ VS CRUZ ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 CRUZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CRUZ ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Zulfa, David, Bittleston, Dawn and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0350

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Zulfa, David

Bittleston, Dawn

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRUZ, MARIA ELENA

Respondent

CRUZ ALVAREZ, HECTOR MIGUEL

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 12/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: CRUZ, MARIA ELENA; Respondent: CRUZ ALVAREZ, HECTOR MIGUEL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MAILED TO WE THE PEOPLE/LEGAL EXPRESS OF PALMDALE/LANCASTER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 12/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MAILED TO WE THE PEOPLE/LEGAL EXPRESS OF PALMDALE/LANCASTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less