This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 09:54:53 (UTC).

CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY VS TEJEDA

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TEJEDA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cervantes, Gina M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1392

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cervantes, Gina M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TEJEDA, ALICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS, MARK R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

03/14/2023: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

03/15/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

03/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

03/15/2023: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

03/15/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Statement

03/27/2023: Statement

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

04/18/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

06/21/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

06/13/2023: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

06/13/2023: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

06/13/2023: Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

Declaration

06/13/2023: Declaration

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C)

03/15/2023: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C)

Rejection/Correction Notice

03/15/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice

06/21/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Case Management Conference 09/11/2023

09/11/2023: Case Management Conference 09/11/2023

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCL-23-011392; Style/Defendant: CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY VS TEJEDA; Case Type: 37-CL <10K Other Contract - Civil Limited; Hearing Type: Case Management Conference; Judge: Cervantes, Gina M.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division L; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina M.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Comment: Continued from 09/11/2023 Default filed?

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCL-23-011392; Style/Defendant: CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY VS TEJEDA; Case Type: 37-CL <10K Other Contract - Civil Limited; Hearing Type: Case Management Conference; Judge: Cervantes, Gina M.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division L; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Comment: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement, 9/11/23, 8:30 a.m., Div. L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Judgment - Does not conform to CRC 3.1806 Breach of Contract requires Original contract or Declaration and Order for Judicial officer to approve the use of copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: Declaration for Default evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2); Comment: Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment; Comment: As to Alicia Tejeda dba Road Opener Logistics on complaint filed 3/14/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: ALICIA TEJEDA DBA: ROAD OPENER LOGISTICS, via Sub-service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketStatement; Comment: Statement of Classification and Location

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: STATEMENT OF CLASSIFICATION AND LOCATION/VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/28/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 04/07/20234:52 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less